Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
28.03.1990 | Refusal of application | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] |
22.12.1987 | First examination report | |
15.12.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] |
26.04.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.06.1986 [1986/24] |