Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4784831 | 15.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US67076784 | 13.11.1984 | US89293786 | 04.08.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0184038 | Global Dossier | 11.06.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67076784 | 13.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1263041 | 21.11.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US67076784 | 13.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61153262 | 11.07.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US67076784 | 13.11.1984 |