EP0184038 - Iron-nickel-chromium-molybdenum alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inco Alloys International, Inc. Huntington West Virginia 25720 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states Inco Alloys International, Inc. Huntington West Virginia 25720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mankins, William Lawrence 594 Fairwood Road Huntington, WV 25705 / US | 02 /
Tipton, David Gary 230 Ginger Road Wilmington, NC 28405 / US | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Greenstreet, Cyril Henry, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | [1986/24] | Application number, filing date | 85114419.6 | 13.11.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | US19840670767 | 13.11.1984 Original published format: US 670767 | [1986/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184038 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/44, C22C30/00 | [1986/24] | CPC: |
C22C30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1986/24] | Title | German: | Eisen-Nickel-Chrom-Molybdänlegierung | [1986/24] | English: | Iron-nickel-chromium-molybdenum alloy | [1986/24] | French: | Alliage fer-nickel-chrome-molybdène | [1986/24] | File destroyed: | 13.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 29.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/20] | 25.12.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB638007 ; | [X]GB741558 ; | [X]GB531466 ; | [X]US3175902 ; | [X]GB2117792 ; | [X]GB993613 ; | [A]GB1508205 |