Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE49695T | 15.02.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP85115248 | 02.12.1985 | DE3445901 | 15.12.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3575516D1 | 01.03.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3575516 | 02.12.1985 | DE3445901 | 15.12.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0185970 | Global Dossier | 24.01.1990 | B1 | EP0185970 | 02.07.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3445901 | 15.12.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8506270 | 26.08.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3445901 | 15.12.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3445901 | 19.06.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3445901 | 15.12.1984 |