EP0185970 - Liquid preparation of disinfecting agents having a wide activity range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bansemir, Klaus, Dr. Ursulaweg 51 D-4018 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
Disch, Karlheinz, Dr. Holbeinstrasse 10 D-5657 Haan / DE | 03 /
Kiewert, Eva, Dr. Am langen Weiher 6 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | [1986/27] | Application number, filing date | 85115248.8 | 02.12.1985 | [1986/27] | Priority number, date | DE19843445901 | 15.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3445901 | [1986/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185970 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185970 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/00, // (A01N59/00, 47:44, 33:12) | [1986/27] | CPC: |
A01N47/44 (EP);
A01N59/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/44, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/44, A01N33/12 (EP);
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N59/00, A01N47/44, A01N33/12 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/27] | Title | German: | Flüssige Desinfektionsmittelzubereitungen mit Breitbandwirkung | [1986/27] | English: | Liquid preparation of disinfecting agents having a wide activity range | [1986/27] | French: | Préparation liquide d'agents désinfectants à large spectre d'activité | [1986/27] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/38] | 31.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP8197598 ; | [Y]EP0041448 (SALKIN NICOLAS); | [Y]EP0087049 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 95, Nr. 22, 30. November 1981, Seite 329, Nr. 192186w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 81 97 598 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO. INC.) 06.08.1981, & JP8197598 A 00000000 |