Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0153792 | Global Dossier | 08.08.1990 | B1 | EP0153792 | 16.09.1987 | A3 | EP0153792 | 04.09.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | SE8401147 | 01.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1262154 | 03.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | SE8401147 | 01.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3579010D1 | 13.09.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | SE8401147 | 01.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI78026C | 12.06.1989 | C | FI78026B | 28.02.1989 | B | FI850777L | 02.09.1985 | L | Priority number | Date | SE8401147 | 01.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0789365B | 27.09.1995 | B2 | JPS60222984 | 07.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | SE8401147 | 01.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE446839 | 13.10.1986 | B | SE8401147L | 02.09.1985 | L | SE8401147D0 | 01.03.1984 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE8401147 | 01.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4602750 | 29.07.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | SE8401147 | 01.03.1984 |