EP0153792 - A device for transport of strip-like information carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For:SE
Philips Norden AB Tegeluddsvägen 1 115 84 Stockholm / SE | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/36] | For:SE
Philips Norden AB Tegeluddsvägen 1 S-11584 Stockholm / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hjortnäs, Erik Rune c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1985/36] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/36] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200290.6 | 28.02.1985 | [1985/36] | Priority number, date | SE19840001147 | 01.03.1984 Original published format: SE 8401147 | [1985/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0153792 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0153792 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0153792 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/24, B41J15/06, B41J15/16, B41J19/78 | [1985/36] | CPC: |
B41J19/78 (EP,US);
B41J11/24 (EP,US);
B41J15/06 (EP,US);
B41J15/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/36] | Title | German: | Transportvorrichtung eines bandähnlichen Aufzeichnungsträgers | [1985/36] | English: | A device for transport of strip-like information carriers | [1985/36] | French: | Dispositif d'avance de support d'information sous forme de bande | [1985/36] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 29.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 08.08.1990 | [2002/23] | Documents cited: | Search | AT221284B [ ] (HELLIGE & CO GMBH F [DE]); | DE3047278 [ ] (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]); | DE956128 [ ] (STENOTYPE GRANDJEAN SA) |