EP0171961 - Capacitive displacement sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTIMA SYSTEMS, INC. 121 Middlesex Turnpike Burlington Massachusetts 01803 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states OPTIMA SYSTEMS, INC. 121 Middlesex Turnpike Burlington Massachusetts 01803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ekchian, Jack A. 6 Duff Street Watertown Massachusetts 02172 / US | 02 /
Hoffman, Robert W. 24 Piedmont Arlington Massachusetts 02172 / US | 03 /
Ekchian, Leon 22228 Victory Boulevard Woodland Hills California 91367 / US | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305364.3 | 26.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | US19840635665 | 30.07.1984 Original published format: US 635665 | [1986/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171961 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01C9/20, G01C9/06 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
G01C9/06 (EP,US);
G01C9/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Lagesensor | [1986/08] | English: | Capacitive displacement sensor | [1986/08] | French: | Détecteur capacitif de déplacement | [1986/08] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 01.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.11.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/19] | 14.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2032110 (SECRETARY INDUSTRY BRIT); | [A]US3906471 (SHAWHAN ELBERT N); | US4256682 [ ] (DENTON DEAN A); | US4427788 [ ] (MIALE JOSEPH N [US], et al); | GB1094360 [ ] (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO); | DE2639285 [ ] (UOP INC); | US3534110 [ ] (JUGUIN BERNARD, et al); | US3843741 [ ] (YAN T); | US4111843 [ ] (FEISTEL GERALD R, et al) |