Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE28851T | 15.08.1987 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | EP85401274 | 25.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU571709B | Global Dossier | 21.04.1988 | B2 | AU4448985 | 09.01.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0167447 | Global Dossier | 12.08.1987 | B1 | EP0167447 | 08.01.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8503186 | 25.03.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1251646 | 28.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3560448D1 | 17.09.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8702310 | 16.12.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2567118 | 14.11.1986 | B1 | FR2567118 | 10.01.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0238528B | 30.08.1990 | B2 | JPS6117428 | 25.01.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR860001012 | 22.02.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT80755 | 12.05.1988 | B | PT80755 | 01.08.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4604123 | 05.08.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA854749 | 26.02.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | FR8410597 | 04.07.1984 |