EP0167447 - Method for heating a glass feeder channel by means of an oxygen-enriched combustible [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desprez, Marc 7, rue Paul Napoléon Roinard F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | 02 /
Laurenceau, Serge 23, rue Champ Lagarde Rés. de la Pépinière F-78000 Versailles / FR | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [1986/02] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401274.7 | 25.06.1985 | [1986/02] | Priority number, date | FR19840010597 | 04.07.1984 Original published format: FR 8410597 | [1986/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0167447 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167447 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C03B7/06 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
C03B7/065 (EP,US);
C03B5/16 (KR);
Y02P40/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Heizen eines Glasspeiserkanals mittels eines sauerstoffreichen Brennstoffes | [1986/02] | English: | Method for heating a glass feeder channel by means of an oxygen-enriched combustible | [1986/02] | French: | Procédé de chauffage d'un canal contenant du verre à l'aide de flammes oxycombustibles | [1987/33] |
Former [1986/02] | Procédé de chauffage d'un canal contenant du verre a l'aide de flammes oxycombustibles | Examination procedure | 29.06.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 14.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3129930 (HONORE LABAT-CAMY ANDRE PIERRE); | [A]US3523781 (LEVEQUE MAURICE J) |