Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3580445D1 | 13.12.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US60586784 | 01.05.1984 | US8500754 | 25.04.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8505058 | Global Dossier | 21.11.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60586784 | 01.05.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4355285 | Global Dossier | 28.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US60586784 | 01.05.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0179143 | Global Dossier | 07.11.1990 | B1 | EP0179143 | 27.04.1988 | A4 | EP0179143 | 30.04.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60586784 | 01.05.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL74924 | 30.12.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US60586784 | 01.05.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61502073 | 18.09.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US60586784 | 01.05.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO855370L | 28.02.1986 | L | Priority number | Date | US60586784 | 01.05.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4555945 | 03.12.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US60586784 | 01.05.1984 |