EP0179143 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A CONTROLLED PRELOAD ON A TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY BY MEANS OF A COMPOSITE MATERIAL SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/18] | METHOD AN APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A CONTROLLED PRELOAD ON A TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY BY MEANS OF A COMPOSITE MATERIAL SLEEVE | ||
[1990/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND DATA CONTROL, INC. Overlake Industrial Park Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [1986/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSON, Richard, A. 21220 N.E. 165th Street Woodinville, WA 98077 / US | [1986/18] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 85902357.4 | 25.04.1985 | [1986/18] | WO1985US00754 | Priority number, date | US19840605867 | 01.05.1984 Original published format: US 605867 | [1986/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8505058 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179143 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179143 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.11.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23P11/02, G01P15/13 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
B23P11/025 (EP,US);
G01P15/132 (EP,US);
Y10T29/43 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49863 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49865 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4987 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/45] |
Former [1986/18] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GESTEUERTEN VORLAST AUF EINE UMWANDLER-EINHEIT MITTELS EINES ÄRMELS AUS KOMPOSITMATERIAL | [1986/18] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A CONTROLLED PRELOAD ON A TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY BY MEANS OF A COMPOSITE MATERIAL SLEEVE | [1990/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UNE PRECHARGE COMMANDEE SUR UN ENSEMBLE TRANSDUCTEUR AU MOYEN D'UN MANCHON EN MATERIAU COMPOSITE | [1986/18] |
Former [1986/18] | METHOD AN APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A CONTROLLED PRELOAD ON A TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY BY MEANS OF A COMPOSITE MATERIAL SLEEVE | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1986 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1986 | Search fee paid | 11.01.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/18] | 04.04.1986 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 21.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 28.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.02.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.11.1990 | NL | 07.11.1990 | [1991/45] |
Former [1991/38] | BE | 07.11.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4379575 (MARTIN CHARLES L) | International search | [A]US3152485 (LONES DAIN B, et al); | [A]US3339419 (WILCOX DOYLE E); | [A]US3673873 (ESTES JOSEPH F, et al); | [A]US3702073 (JACOBS EARL D); | [A]US3792526 (BREMSETH G); | [A]US4169309 (MEGINNIS CHARLES E [US]) |