EP0189771 - (Isoxazol-3-yl)arylmethanones, a process for their preparation and their use as medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tegeler, John J. 40 Highland Avenue Bridgewater, N.J. 08807 / US | 02 /
Diamond, Craig J. Eagle Rock Village Bldg. 9, Apt. 2B Budd Lake, N.J. 07828 / US | [1986/32] | Representative(s) | Becker, Heinrich Karl Engelbert, et al HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Gebäude F 821 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | Becker, Heinrich Karl Engelbert, Dr., et al HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100345.7 | 13.01.1986 | [1986/32] | Priority number, date | US19850693508 | 22.01.1985 Original published format: US 693508 | [1986/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189771 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189771 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D261/08, A61K31/42 | [1986/32] | CPC: |
C07D261/08 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/32] | Title | German: | (Isoxazol-3-yl)arylmethanone, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Arzneimittel | [1986/32] | English: | (Isoxazol-3-yl)arylmethanones, a process for their preparation and their use as medicaments | [1986/32] | French: | (Isoxazol-3-yl)arylméthanones, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation à titre de médicaments | [1986/32] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 05.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/23] | 11.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1180268 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [A]DE1770639 (ICI LTD); | [A]GB1065889 (SHIONOGI & CO); | [A]GB1067203 (SHIONOGI & CO); | [A]GB1067806 (SHIONOGI & CO); | [A]DE1470261 (SHIONOGI & CO); | [L]FR2422667 (SANKYO CO [JP]) |