EP0220514 - Composition for increasing the quantity and quality of fruits and flowers of plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1991 [1991/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo, 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kajita, Toshio 13-13-9, Yachiyodai Kita Yachiyo-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Furushima, Masakazu 134-165, Kita Nagareyama-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Takematsu, Tesuo 612, Mine-machi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113368.4 | 29.09.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | JP19850214477 | 30.09.1985 Original published format: JP 21447785 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220514 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220514 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A01N49/00, // (A01N49/00, 33:12) | [1987/19] | CPC: |
A01N49/00 (EP);
Y02A40/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N49/00, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N49/00, A01N33/12 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/19] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Erhöhung der Quantität und der Qualität von Pflanzenfrüchten und -blüten | [1987/19] | English: | Composition for increasing the quantity and quality of fruits and flowers of plants | [1987/19] | French: | Composition pour augmenter la quantité et la qualité des fruits et des fleurs des plantes | [1987/19] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 12.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 05.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/16] | Request for further processing for: | 08.02.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4346226 (THOMPSON MALCOLM J, et al); | [A]GB2059412 (ISRAEL MINI AGRICULT) |