EP0219762 - Process for the preparation of an administration and dosage for drugs, reagents or other active substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Desitin Arzneimittel GmbH Weg beim Jäger 214 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | [1987/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Wolfgang, Dr. Reembroden 44 D-2000 Hamburg 63 / DE | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113919.4 | 07.10.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | DE19853536024 | 09.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3536024 | [1987/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0219762 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0219762 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/24, A61K9/70 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
A61K9/7007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/09] |
Former [1987/18] | ES, GR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Darreichungs- und Dosierungsform für Arzneimittel-Wirkstoffe, Reagentien oder andere Wirkstoffe | [1987/18] | English: | Process for the preparation of an administration and dosage for drugs, reagents or other active substances | [1987/18] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une forme d'administration et de dosage pour des médicaments, des réactifs ou d'autres substances actives | [1987/18] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1989/18: Verbunden mit 86906303.2/0283474 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 23.01.89 | EPB 1989/18: Consolidated with 86906303.2/0283474 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 23.01.89 | EPB 1989/18: Jointe à la demande no.86906303.2/0283474 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 23.01.89 | EPB 1989/13: 230189 | EPB 1989/13: 230189 | EPB 1989/13: 230189 | Examination procedure | 19.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 13.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7654917 ; | [A]GB139077 (EDMUND MORSE POND); | [A]GB1061557 (ASHE CHEMICAL LTD); | [A]DE2746414 (GERLACH EDUARD CHEM FAB) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 85, Nr. 10, 6. September 1976, Seite 364, Zusammenfassung Nr. 68303m, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-76 54 917 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD.) 14.05.1976, & JP7654917 A 00000000 |