|
19.04.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1994 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1993 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.11.1993 |
Withdrawal of application |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1993 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1993 |
Withdrawal of application |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1993 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.10.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1992 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.04.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.03.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.1990 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1990 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.1990 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.08.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.04.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.11.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.1987 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1987 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1987 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.1986 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1986 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
28.11.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.11.1986 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
20.11.1986 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |