Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3680095D1 | 08.08.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3680095 | 28.11.1986 | DE3543240 | 06.12.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6604386 | Global Dossier | 11.06.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3543240 | 06.12.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0232491 | Global Dossier | 03.07.1991 | B1 | EP0232491 | 19.08.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3543240 | 06.12.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DD260513 | 28.09.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3543240 | 06.12.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3543240 | 11.06.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3543240 | 06.12.1985 |