EP0225609 - Hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 25.08.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.1993 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum Gesellschaft m.b.H. Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | For all designated states Julius Blum Gesellschaft m.b.H. Industriestrasse 1 A-6973 Höchst / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röck, Erich Küferstrasse 7 A-6973 Höchst / AT | 02 /
Brüstle, Klaus Fellentorstrasse 23 A-6923 Lauterach / AT | 03 /
Rupprechter, Helmut Sandgasse 5b A-6923 Lauterach / AT | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 86116878.9 | 04.12.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | AT19850003569 | 10.12.1985 Original published format: AT 356985 | AT19860000313 | 10.02.1986 Original published format: AT 31386 | DE19860011716U | 29.04.1986 Original published format: DE 8611716 U | [1987/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225609 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225609 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0225609 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E05D5/02, E05D7/04 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
E05D7/125 (EP,US);
E05D7/0407 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/53 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/25] | Title | German: | Scharnier | [1987/25] | English: | Hinge | [1987/25] | French: | Charnière | [1987/25] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/26: Teilanmeldung 90110769.8 eingereicht am 04/12/86 | EPB 1991/26: Divisional application 90110769.8 filed on 04/12/86 | EPB 1991/26: Demande divisionnaire 90110769.8 déposée le 04/12/86 | Examination procedure | 02.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 08.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP90110769.8 / EP0392570 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.1992
30.04.1992
ADMISSIBLE Grass AG Bundesstrasse 10 A- 6973 Höchst / AT Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.1992
30.04.1992
ADMISSIBLE Grass AG Bundesstrasse 10 A- 6973 Höchst / AT Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing., Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 D-88113 Lindau / DE | 16.04.1992 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 25.04.1992 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 06.05.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.07.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 20.05.1993 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3969787 (ROECK ERICH [AT], et al); | [AD]AT360856B (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]); | [A]DE3119571 (LAUTENSCHLAEGER KG KARL [DE]); | [A]AT371205B (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]); | [XP]WO8602402 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) |