Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.05.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] |
13.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] |
22.01.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] |
13.07.1990 | First examination report | |
21.06.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] |
07.03.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 26.04.1989 [1989/17] |
27.09.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.11.1986 [1986/46] |