Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU616822B | Global Dossier | 07.11.1991 | B2 | AU4573689 | 05.04.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | AU4573689 | 30.11.1989 | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE86715T | 15.03.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP86303365 | 02.05.1986 | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1261174 | 26.09.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | CA508446 | 06.05.1986 | CA586273 | 16.12.1988 | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5153832 | 06.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US38483089 | 21.07.1989 | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5337234 | 09.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US38483089 | 21.07.1989 | US86466492 | 05.05.1992 | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU593546B | Global Dossier | 15.02.1990 | B2 | AU5633486 | 13.11.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0201297 | Global Dossier | 10.03.1993 | B1 | EP0201297 | 26.04.1989 | A3 | EP0201297 | 12.11.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1261174C | 26.09.1989 | C | CA1256209 | 20.06.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3687919T | 02.09.1993 | T2 | DE3687919D1 | 15.04.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO173069C | 20.10.1993 | C | NO173069B | 12.07.1993 | B | NO861778L | 07.11.1986 | L | Priority number | Date | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG47393G | 25.06.1993 | G | Priority number | Date | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4866607 | 12.09.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US73123085 | 06.05.1985 |