EP0201297 - Downhole memory gauge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Terry Owen 1507 Archway Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 02 /
Dant, Ronald Edward 514 Westside Drive Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 03 /
Tilgham, Stephen Edgar 2012 Walnut Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 04 /
White, Billy Wayne Route 2, Box 87 Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 05 /
Lynch, Michael Joseph Route 6, Box 2475 Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 06 /
van Berg, Charles Frances, Jr. 2305 West Club Road Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 07 /
Richardson, John Mark 2518 Virginia Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 08 /
Penn, Jack Carmen 625 Blackjack Lane Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 09 /
Forehand, Gilbert Horton 1210 E. Camelback Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 10 /
Duncan, Richard Luis 2209 Spruce Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 11 /
Donaghue, Charles Doyle 4610 Willowridge Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | [1986/46] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Wain, Christopher Paul A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303365.0 | 02.05.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | US19850731230 | 06.05.1985 Original published format: US 731230 | [1986/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0201297 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0201297 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0201297 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/00 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
E21B47/26 (EP,US);
E21B47/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/46] | Title | German: | Messsonde mit Speicher für Bohrloch | [1993/10] | English: | Downhole memory gauge | [1986/46] | French: | Sonde à mémoire pour trou de forage | [1993/10] |
Former [1986/46] | Messstreifen mit Speicher für Bohrloch | ||
Former [1986/46] | Jauge à mémoire pour trace de forage | Examination procedure | 12.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 18.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.1993 | [1994/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4161782 (MCCRACKEN OLIVER W [US]); | [A]FR2515725 (FLOPETROL ETU FABRICATIONS [FR]) |