Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0216468 | Global Dossier | 11.11.1987 | A3 | EP0216468 | 01.04.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IL7648785 | 24.09.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI863022 | 25.03.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | IL7648785 | 24.09.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS62107102 | 18.05.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | IL7648785 | 24.09.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR870003273 | 16.04.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | IL7648785 | 24.09.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4742590 | 10.05.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | IL7648785 | 24.09.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA865471 | 25.03.1987 | B | Priority number | Date | IL7648785 | 24.09.1985 |