EP0216468 - A bridging kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The State of Israel Ministry of Defence Israel Military Industries 64 Sderoth Bialik P.O.Box 1044 Ramat Hasharon 47 100 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states THE STATE OF ISRAEL MINISTRY OF DEFENCE ISRAEL MILITARY INDUSTRIES 64 Sderoth Bialik P.O.Box 1044 Ramat Hasharon 47 100 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glassman, Ami 32 Hague Street Haifa / IE | 02 /
Yechiely, Shelomo 58 Hanita Street Haifa 32 443 / IE | [1987/14] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86305756.8 | 25.07.1986 | [1987/14] | Priority number, date | IL19870000764 | 24.09.1985 Original published format: IL 76487 | [1987/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0216468 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0216468 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E01D15/14 | [1987/14] | CPC: |
E01D15/14 (EP,US);
E01D15/12 (KR);
E01D15/00 (KR);
E01D15/127 (KR);
E01D15/133 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/14] | Title | German: | Brückenausrüstung | [1987/14] | English: | A bridging kit | [1987/14] | French: | Equipement d'un pont | [1987/14] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 13.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/01] | 10.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.05.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE197651 ; | [A]DE507425 (DEMAG AG); | [Y]GB771440 (MINI OF SUPPLY); | [A]US3004391 (MILLER LESLIE C); | [A]FR1516220 ; | [Y]NL7203341 | [A] - JANE'S COMBAT SUPPORT EQUIPMENT YEARBOOK 1978/1979, 1978, page 83, LondonGB; "Aluminium floating footbridge" |