EP0220849 - Pharmaceutical compositions having cytoprotective properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Home Products Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borella, Luis Enrique 5 Jacob Drive Lawrenceville New Jersey / US | 02 /
Dijoseph, John Francis 571 Linden Avenue Woodbridge New Jersey / US | 03 /
Mir, Ghulam Nabi P.O. Box 392 Buckingham Pennsylvania 18912 / US | 04 /
Reuter, Gerald Louis 23 Crescent Drive Plattsburgh New York 12901 / US | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Porter, Graham Ronald, et al C/O John Wyeth & Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Porter, Graham Ronald, et al C/O John Wyeth & Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307619.6 | 02.10.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | US19850785417 | 08.10.1985 Original published format: US 785417 | US19860831756 | 20.02.1986 Original published format: US 831756 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220849 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220849 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/08, // (A61K33/08, 33:00, 31:19) | [1987/19] | CPC: |
A61K33/06 (KR);
A61K33/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/08, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/08, A61K33/00, A61K31/19 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/19] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen mit zellschützenden Eigenschaften | [1987/19] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions having cytoprotective properties | [1987/19] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques à propriétés cytopréservatrices | [1987/19] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 26.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP7413319 ; | [X]FR2103569 (RICHARDSON MERRELL INC [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 80, no. 26, 1st July 1974, pages 193-194, no. 149115a, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-74 13 319 (FUJI CHEMICAL INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.) 05-02-1974, & JP7413319 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 17, 25th April 1983, page 47, no. 137460t, Columbus, Ohio, US; I. SZELENYI: "Cytoprotection with antacids" & PATHOPHYSIOL. PHARMAKOTHER. PEPTISCHEN GESCHWUERS, [SYMP.] 1981 (PUB. 1982), 151-6 |