EP0220972 - Method and apparatus for controlling the drying process of a tobacco sample having a certain weight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.1993 [1993/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'EXPLOITATION INDUSTRIELLE DES TABACS ET ALLUMETTES 53, quai d'Orsay 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'EXPLOITATION INDUSTRIELLE DES TABACS ET ALLUMETTES 53, quai d'Orsay F-75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prigent, Daniel 29, rue des Aydes F-45000 Orléans (Loiret) / FR | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402024.3 | 16.09.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | FR19850013967 | 20.09.1985 Original published format: FR 8513967 | [1987/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220972 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220972 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N5/04, G05D23/20 | [1987/19] | CPC: |
G01N5/045 (EP);
A24B9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontrollierten Trocknung einer bestimmten Masse einer Tabakprobe | [1987/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling the drying process of a tobacco sample having a certain weight | [1987/19] | French: | Procédé et appareil de dessication contrôlée d'une masse d'un échantillon de tabac | [1987/19] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 31.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58162839 ; | [A]DE2028909 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V); | [A]FR2275767 (ALSTHOM CGEE [FR]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 290 (P-245)[1435], page 29 P 245, 24 décembre 1983; & JP-A-58 162 839 (KETSUTO KAGAKU KENKYUSHO K.K.) 27-09-1983, & JP58162839 A 00000000 |