EP0263226 - A method and an instrument for monitoring the cooling conditions in a light water reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becker, Kurt, Professor Illerstigen 16 S-171 71 Solna / SE | [1988/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Barnieske, Hans Wolfgang, et al c/o H.W. Barnieske Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 25 Turingegatan 26 S-151 21 Södertälje 1 / SE | [1989/02] |
Former [1988/15] | Barnieske, Hans Wolfgang c/o H.W. Barnieske Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 25 Turingegatan 26 S-151 21 Södertälje 1 / SE | Application number, filing date | 86850340.0 | 08.10.1986 | [1988/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263226 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263226 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/24, G01K7/20, G21C17/02 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
G01F23/247 (EP,US);
G21C17/035 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Instrument zur Überwachung des Kühlungszustandes in einem Leichtwasserreaktor | [1988/15] | English: | A method and an instrument for monitoring the cooling conditions in a light water reactor | [1988/15] | French: | Méthode et instrument pour surveiller les conditions de refroidissement dans un réacteur à eau légère | [1988/15] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.1990 | IT | 10.01.1990 | NL | 10.01.1990 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.01.1990 | |
IT | 10.01.1990 | ||
NL | 10.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/52] | AT | 10.01.1990 | |
NL | 10.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/43] | NL | 10.01.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4216675 (NAGATA KUNIO [JP], et al); | [A]FR2518747 (SEREG SOC [FR]); | [X]DE3327047 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]GB2143950 (MCQUEEN MALCOLM M) |