EP0232785 - Hydroxylated 1,2-diaminocyclohexane platinum complexes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hlavka, Joseph John Pine Hill Road Tuxedo New York 10987 / US | 02 /
Lin, Yang-I 4 Pelham Court Nanuet New York 10954 / US | 03 /
Bitha, Panayota 128 Country Club Lane Pomona New York 10970 / US | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101032.8 | 26.01.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | US19860824479 | 31.01.1986 Original published format: US 824479 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232785 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232785 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C215/44, C07F15/00, A61K33/24 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
C07F15/0093 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/34] | C07C91/14, C07F15/00, A61K33/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Hydroxylierte 1,2-Diamincyclohexan Platinkomplexe | [1987/34] | English: | Hydroxylated 1,2-diaminocyclohexane platinum complexes | [1987/34] | French: | Complexes de 1,2-diaminocyclohexane hydroxylé de platine | [1987/34] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 28.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2352061 (LABAZ); | [A]US4092359 (DANIELS PETER J L, et al); | [X]EP0098135 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]); | [AP]EP0185225 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) |