Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
20.07.1990 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] |
21.12.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 07.02.1990 [1990/06] |
05.12.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.01.1988 [1988/03] |