Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0253362 | Global Dossier | 07.02.1990 | A3 | EP0253362 | 20.01.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IT2250986 | 14.07.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT209202Z | 20.09.1988 | Z2 | IT8622509V0 | 14.07.1986 | V0 | Priority number | Date | IT2250986 | 14.07.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6321080 | 28.01.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | IT2250986 | 14.07.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4800658 | 31.01.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | IT2250986 | 14.07.1986 |