EP0253362 - Adjustable rear closing device for ski boots [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calzaturificio Tecnica SpA Via General Gandolfo 24 I-31040 Nervesa della Battaglia (Treviso) / IT | [1988/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanatta, Ruggero Via VIII Armata I-31040 Nervesa della Battaglia (TV) / IT | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110161.4 | 14.07.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | IT19860022509U | 14.07.1986 Original published format: IT 2250986 U | [1988/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0253362 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0253362 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
A43C11/00 (EP,US);
A43B5/0415 (EP,US);
A43B5/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1988/03] | Title | German: | Einstellbarer hinterer Verschluss für Schistiefel | [1988/03] | English: | Adjustable rear closing device for ski boots | [1988/03] | French: | Fermeture ajustable pour chaussures de ski | [1988/03] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0073433 (NORDICA SPA [IT]); | [Y]EP0086908 (LANGE INT SA [CH]) |