Cited in | Search | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP58134635
[ ]; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP6139044
[ ]; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP60262157
[ ]; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP5917841
[ ]; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | SU228527
[ ]; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US2184023
[Y] (SHEPPARD SAMUEL E, et al); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | FR944061
[Y] (KODAK PATHE); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | FR944294
[Y] (KODAK PATHE); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | FR1406295
[Y] (KODAK PATHE); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | DE1447761
[Y] (OLIVETTI & CO SPA); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | FR2119737
[Y] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | GB2068943
[Y] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | DE3226163
[Y] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 249 (P-234)[1394], 5th November 1983; & JP-A-58 134 635 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K.) 10-08-1983, & JP58134635 A 00000000 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 195, (P-475)[2251], 9th July 1986; & JP-A-61 39 044 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND. CO., LTD) 25-02-1986, & JP6139044 A 00000000 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 143, (P-459)[2200] 27th May 1986; & JP-A-60 262 157 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM K.K.) 25-12-1985, & JP60262157 A 00000000 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9 no. 37 (P-335)[1760], 16th February 1985; & JP-A-59 17 841 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM K.K.) 09-10-84, & JP5917841 A 00000000 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 77, no. 2, 10th July 1972, page 513, abstract no. 12284y, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-228 527 (LENINGRAD ALL-UNION SCIENTIFIC³RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF THE PHOTOGRAPHIC CHEMICAL INDUSTRY) 26-01-1972, & SU228527 A 00000000 | Cited in | Examination | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | EP0244697
|