Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0255730
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
29.11.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] |
06.10.1994 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] |
10.08.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] |
15.10.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] |
12.09.1990 |
First examination report |
|
18.10.1989 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.12.1989 [1989/49] |
02.06.1989 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.07.1989 [1989/29] |
05.12.1988 |
Publication of search report |
published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] |
24.12.1987 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.02.1988 [1988/06] |