Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0255730 | Global Dossier | 01.12.1993 | B1 | EP0255730 | 25.01.1989 | A3 | EP0255730 | 10.02.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP18432986 | 07.08.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3788315T | 31.03.1994 | T2 | DE3788315D1 | 13.01.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP18432986 | 07.08.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6341853 | 23.02.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18432986 | 07.08.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4898812 | 06.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18432986 | 07.08.1986 |