EP0255730 - Silver halide color photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/06] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoki, Kozo Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd No. 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Furutachi, Nobuo Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd No. 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1988/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/06] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87111407.0 | 06.08.1987 | [1988/06] | Priority number, date | JP19860184329 | 07.08.1986 Original published format: JP 18432986 | [1988/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0255730 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0255730 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255730 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/34, // C07D215/22 | [1988/06] | CPC: |
G03C7/3006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/06] | Title | German: | Farbphotographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1988/06] | English: | Silver halide color photographic material | [1988/06] | French: | Matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent | [1988/06] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 14.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.12.1993 | NL | 01.12.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/03] | NL | 01.12.1993 | |
FR | 22.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 01.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | JP58134635 [ ]; | JP6139044 [ ]; | JP60262157 [ ]; | JP5917841 [ ]; | SU228527 [ ]; | [Y]US2184023 (SHEPPARD SAMUEL E, et al); | [Y]FR944061 (KODAK PATHE); | [Y]FR944294 (KODAK PATHE); | [Y]FR1406295 (KODAK PATHE); | [Y]DE1447761 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA); | [Y]FR2119737 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]GB2068943 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]DE3226163 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 249 (P-234)[1394], 5th November 1983; & JP-A-58 134 635 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K.) 10-08-1983, & JP58134635 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 195, (P-475)[2251], 9th July 1986; & JP-A-61 39 044 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND. CO., LTD) 25-02-1986, & JP6139044 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 143, (P-459)[2200] 27th May 1986; & JP-A-60 262 157 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM K.K.) 25-12-1985, & JP60262157 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9 no. 37 (P-335)[1760], 16th February 1985; & JP-A-59 17 841 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM K.K.) 09-10-84, & JP5917841 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 77, no. 2, 10th July 1972, page 513, abstract no. 12284y, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-228 527 (LENINGRAD ALL-UNION SCIENTIFIC³RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF THE PHOTOGRAPHIC CHEMICAL INDUSTRY) 26-01-1972, & SU228527 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0244697 |