EP0277309 - Quick-acting slide valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.12.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Babcock Werke Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Strasse 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states Deutsche Babcock Werke Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Strasse 375 D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Walter Obermeidericher Strasse 42 D-4100 Duisburg 12 / DE | 02 /
Mehrhoff, Willi Ottilienstrasse 61 D-4200 Oberhausen 1 / DE | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Müller, Jürgen Deutsche Babcock AG Lizenz- und Patentabteilung Duisburger Strasse 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Müller, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Babcock AG Lizenz- und Patentabteilung Duisburger Strasse 375 D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117852.1 | 03.12.1987 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | DE19873703303 | 04.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3703303 | [1988/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277309 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277309 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16K27/04, F16K31/122, F16K3/00 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
F16K31/1223 (EP);
F16K17/00 (EP);
F16K27/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [1988/32] | Title | German: | Schnellschluss-Absperrschieber | [1988/32] | English: | Quick-acting slide valve | [1988/32] | French: | Soupape à tiroir à fermeture rapide | [1988/32] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 31.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.1991
11.04.1991
ADMISSIBLE Klein, Schanzlin & Becker AG Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | [1991/17] | 15.04.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.08.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.08.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 04.10.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 29.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.09.1992 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1993/13] | CH | 30.05.1990 | |
LI | 30.05.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | DE3616875 [ ] (PLEIGER MASCHF PAUL [DE]); | AT293123B [ ] (ACF IND INC); | US4596267 [ ] (TOSSEGHINI HUGO [FR]); | US3907248 [ ] (COULBECK MAXWELL GLOVER) |