EP0281692 - Additive for lubricants and hydrocarbon fuels comprising reaction products of olefins, sulfur, hydrogen sulfide and nitrogen containing polymeric compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Law, Derek Alwyn 508 Columbia Avenue Pitman New Jersey 08071 / US | 02 /
Horodysky, Andrew Gene 139 Weston Drive Cherry Hill New Jersey 08003 / US | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Anthony, et al Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | [1988/37] | Application number, filing date | 87302031.7 | 10.03.1987 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0281692 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C10M133/52, C10M159/12, C10L1/24, // (C10N30/04, 30:06, 60:00, 60:10),(C10M159/12, 125:06, 125:22, 127:00, 133:52) | [1988/37] | CPC: |
C10M135/04 (EP);
C10L1/2493 (EP);
C10M159/12 (EP);
C10M2215/04 (EP);
C10M2215/042 (EP);
C10M2215/086 (EP);
C10M2215/22 (EP);
C10M2215/221 (EP);
C10M2215/225 (EP);
C10M2215/226 (EP);
C10M2215/26 (EP);
C10M2215/28 (EP);
C10M2215/30 (EP);
C10M2217/00 (EP);
C10M2217/02 (EP);
C10M2217/04 (EP);
C10M2217/046 (EP);
C10M2217/06 (EP);
C10M2219/022 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/37] | Title | German: | Additive für Schmiermittel und Kohlenwasserstofftreibstoffe, die Reaktionsprodukte von Olefinen, Schwefel, Schwefelwasserstoff und stickstoffhaltigen polymeren Verbindungen enthalten | [1988/37] | English: | Additive for lubricants and hydrocarbon fuels comprising reaction products of olefins, sulfur, hydrogen sulfide and nitrogen containing polymeric compounds | [1988/37] | French: | Additifs pour lubrifiants et combustibles hydrocarbonés comprenant des produits de réaction d'oléfines, du soufre, d'hydrogène sulfuré et de composés polymériques contenant de l'azote | [1988/37] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 04.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.11.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US4661274 ; | [E]EP0215610 ; | [X]US4584113 ; | [Y]US4191659 ; | [X]US4486321 ; | [A]US4549974 ; | [YD]US4344854 ; | [YD]US3390086 ; | [YD]US3676346 ; | [Y]GB2034747 ; | [Y]US3664955 ; | [Y]EP0016660 |