Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0273544 | Global Dossier | 07.02.1990 | A3 | EP0273544 | 06.07.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8622283 | 17.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1296497 | 03.03.1992 | C | Priority number | Date | GB8622283 | 17.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8622283D0 | 22.10.1986 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8622283 | 17.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6375192 | 05.04.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8622283 | 17.09.1986 |