EP0273544 - Continuous process for the dyeing of polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Du Pont Canada Inc. Box 2200, Streetsville Postal Station Mississauga Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Du Pont Canada Inc. Box 2200, Streetsville Postal Station Mississauga, Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA | ||
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states DU PONT CANADA INC. Box 2200 Streetsville Postal Station Mississauga Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boocok, John Roger Brooke 730 Holgate Crescent Kingston Ontario K7M 5A6 / CA | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Ellis, John Clifford H., et al MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Ellis, John Clifford Holgate, et al MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87307774.7 | 03.09.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | GB19860022283 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: GB 8622283 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273544 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273544 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D06P7/00, B05D7/20, B29C47/00, B29C47/02, D01F11/02 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
D01F11/04 (EP);
B29C48/14 (EP);
B29C48/15 (EP);
B29C48/05 (EP);
B29C48/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/27] | D01F11/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/27] | Title | German: | Kontinuverfahren zum Färben von Polymeren | [1988/27] | English: | Continuous process for the dyeing of polymers | [1988/27] | French: | Procédé de teinture en continu de polymères | [1988/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 13.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/47] | 19.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP7423267 ; | [X]DE1177279 (SPINSTOFFFABRIK ZEHLENDORF AG); | [X]DE1469138 (ZEHLENDORF SPINNSTOFF); | [Y]EP0207205 (DU PONT CANADA [CA]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 82, no. 10, 10th March 1975, page 130, no. 59788i, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-74 23 267 (KURARAY CO., LTD) 14-06-1974, & JP7423267 A 00000000 |