EP0239551 - Friction joint of cone coupling type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FFV Transmission Aktiebolag S-580 13 Linköping / SE | [1987/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Disborg, Lennart c/o FFV Transmission AB S-580 13 Linköping / SE | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Avellan-Hultman, Olle Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | Avellan-Hultman, Olle Avellan-Hultman Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 5366 S-102 49 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 87850004.0 | 09.01.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | SE19860000861 | 26.02.1986 Original published format: SE 8600861 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0239551 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/08 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
F16D1/094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | Konische Reibungskupplung | [1987/40] | English: | Friction joint of cone coupling type | [1987/40] | French: | Joint de friction du type à cône d'accouplement | [1987/40] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 13.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 30.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/28] | 13.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1206668 ; | [X]GB2034861 ; | [Y]FR2514443 ; | [Y]US3638974 ; | [X]US4053244 ; | [X]US2452458 ; | [X]GB512568 ; | [X]DE2243172 ; | [A]DE1963480 ; | [A]US1393064 ; | [AD]DE883986 ; | [AD]US2691541 ; | [AD]US3849015 |