Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0263157
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.01.1993 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] |
06.02.1992 |
Licence |
published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] |
24.01.1992 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] |
02.01.1992 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] |
02.01.1992 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] |
03.01.1991 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] |
07.11.1989 |
First examination report |
|
13.05.1988 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.06.1988 [1988/26] |
24.02.1988 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.04.1988 [1988/15] |