Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3777311D1 | 16.04.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8605759 | 22.04.1986 | FR8700132 | 22.04.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8706740 | Global Dossier | 05.11.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8605759 | 22.04.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0263157 | Global Dossier | 11.03.1992 | B1 | EP0263157 | 13.04.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8605759 | 22.04.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2597688 | 08.04.1994 | B1 | FR2597688 | 23.10.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8605759 | 22.04.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4885569 | 05.12.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8605759 | 22.04.1986 |