EP0289620 - COMPOSITION FOR ACID GAS ABSORBENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/45] | COMPOSITION FOR ACID GAS ABSORBENT | ||
[1993/12] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOHO KAGAKU KOGYO CO. LTD 1-14-9, Kakigara-cho Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | For all designated states STATE SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH AND DESIGNING INSTITUTE FOR NITROGEN INDUSTRY AND FOR PRODUCTS OF ORGANIC SYNTHESIS J-28 Chikalova Street, 50 Moscow / SU | [1988/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIHARA, Takeshi 2-2-23, Sakurayama Zushi-shi Kanagawa 249 / JP | 02 /
TAGATA, Norio 2-26-14, Akabane-Nishi Kita-ku Tokyo 115 / JP | 03 /
SHIMIZU, Toshimitsu 106, Nanashima-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221 / JP | 04 /
MATSUDA, Tetsu 4428, Kamariya-cho Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Norio 1-17-1, Awata Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239 / JP | 06 /
UENO, Isamu 4-18-4, Iwato Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239 / JP | 07 /
Josif, Leizerovich Leites ko 84, 12, U 1 Donetskaya Moscow / SU | 08 /
Julia, Glebovna Garpova ko 9, 4, ul Capotnia Moscow / SU | 09 /
Tatiana, Vladimirovna Zhitkova ko 11, 44, 06L Moskovskaya Vidnoe / SU | [1989/13] |
Former [1988/45] | 01 /
HIHARA, Takeshi 2-2-23, Sakurayama Zushi-shi Kanagawa 249 / JP | ||
02 /
TAGATA, Norio 2-26-14, Akabane-Nishi Kita-ku Tokyo 115 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMIZU, Toshimitsu 106, Nanashima-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUDA, Tetsu 4428, Kamariya-cho Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | |||
05 /
TAKAHASHI, Norio 1-17-1, Awata Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239 / JP | |||
06 /
UENO, Isamu 4-18-4, Iwato Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239 / JP | Representative(s) | Boutin, Antoine, et al Brema-Loyer Le Centralis 63 avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Boutin, Antoine, et al Brema-Loyer 161, rue de Courcelles 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/29] | Boutin, Antoine, et al Cabinet Tony-Durand 77, Rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1988/45] | Tony-Durand, Serge Cabinet Tony-Durand 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87907139.7 | 30.10.1987 | [1988/45] | WO1987JP00837 | Priority number, date | JP19860256968 | 30.10.1986 Original published format: JP 25696886 | [1988/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803051 | Date: | 05.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289620 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, B01D53/34 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
B01D53/1493 (EP);
Y02C20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR SAURES GASABSORBENS | [1993/12] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR ACID GAS ABSORBENTS | [1993/12] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ABSORBANTES DE GAZ ACIDE | [1993/13] |
Former [1988/45] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR SAURES GASABSORBENS | ||
Former [1988/45] | COMPOSITION FOR ACID GAS ABSORBENT | ||
Former [1988/45] | COMPOSITION DE GAZ ABSORBANT ACIDE | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.1988 | Translation filed | 27.06.1988 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.1988 | Search fee paid | 27.06.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/50] | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/44] | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8503282 (CHEVRON RES [US]); | [A]WO8605474 (PARSONS CO RALPH M [US]); | [A]EP0074894 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR], et al) | International search | JPS525679 [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | JPH04823782B [ ]; | JPS60156629 [ ] (NORTON CO) |