EP0302269 - Slant service rig [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1988 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.1989 [1989/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suncor Inc. 500 - 4th Avenue S.W. Calgary Alberta T2P 2V5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states Suncor Inc. 500 - 4th Avenue S.W. Calgary Alberta T2P 2V5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ballchey, John M. 1409 Hull Estates 1200 6th Street S.W. Calgary Alberta T2R 1H3 / CA | 02 /
Ward, George S. 2624 Palliser Drive S.W. Calgary Alberta T2V 4G8 / CA | 03 /
Johnson, clarence William 1815 Palliser Drive S.W. Calgary Alberta T2V 4C4 / CA | 04 /
Jankowski, Leon V. 3320-24th St N.W. Calgary Alberta T2M 3Z7 / CA | 05 /
Ward, John R. Box 176 Ardmore Alberta T0A 1T0 / CA | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88111203.1 | 18.02.1986 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | CA19850474684 | 19.02.1985 Original published format: CA 474684 | [1989/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302269 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E21B15/04 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
E21B15/04 (EP,US);
E21B15/003 (EP,US);
E21B7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Bohrwinde für geneigte Bohrungen | [1989/06] | English: | Slant service rig | [1989/06] | French: | Derrick de service pour forages inclinés | [1989/06] | File destroyed: | 28.04.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 21.12.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86301096.3 / EP0192452 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4068487 (PEASE FLOYD TIM, et al); | [Y]DE1196606 (GEORGE E FAILING COMPANY); | [Y]US3464507 (ALEXANDER EMMETT L, et al); | [A]US3805902 (STORM J, et al) | [A] - WORLD OIL, vol. 178, no. 5, April 1974, pages 119-120, Gulf Publishing Co., Houston, TexasUS; "New slant hole rig has increased horsepower" |