Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0305898
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.03.1993 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] |
03.04.1992 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] |
26.06.1991 |
First examination report |
|
03.08.1990 |
Change - language of procedure |
published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] |
02.08.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] |
17.01.1990 |
Publication of search report |
published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] |
22.12.1989 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.02.1990 [1990/06] |
22.12.1989 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.02.1990 [1990/06] |
08.12.1989 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.01.1990 [1990/04] |
21.01.1989 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] |