Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3871290D1 | 25.06.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3871290 | 25.08.1988 | DE3729268 | 02.09.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0305898 | Global Dossier | 20.05.1992 | B1 | EP0305898 | 07.03.1990 | A3 | EP0305898 | 08.03.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3729268 | 02.09.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3729268 | 16.03.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3729268 | 02.09.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI93366C | 27.03.1995 | C | FI93366B | 15.12.1994 | B | FI884035 | 03.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3729268 | 02.09.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6470502 | 16.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3729268 | 02.09.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4963271 | 16.10.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3729268 | 02.09.1987 |