EP0305898 - Process for the isolation and purification of cellulose ethers and other derivatives of cellulose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/10] | Process and apparatus for the isolation and purification of cellulose ethers and other derivatives of cellulose | ||
[1992/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rähse, Wilfried, Dr. Kolhagenstrasse 44 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 02 /
Wüst, Willi, Dr. Fasanenring 32 D-4030 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
Kühne, Norbert Dürerstrasse 63 D-5657 Haan 2 / DE | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113862.2 | 25.08.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | DE19873729268 | 02.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3729268 | [1989/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0305898 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0305898 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305898 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/50, C08B11/20 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
C08B11/20 (EP,US);
B01D29/114 (EP,US);
B01D29/52 (EP);
B01D29/668 (EP);
B01D29/78 (EP);
B01D29/84 (EP);
B01D29/885 (EP);
B01D35/16 (EP,US);
B01D2201/0484 (EP,US);
B01D2201/085 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01D29/114, B01D29/52, B01D29/668, B01D29/78, B01D29/84, B01D29/885 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/06] | B01D29/32, C08B11/20 | ||
Former IPC [1989/10] | C08B11/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung und Reinigung von Celluloseethern und anderen Cellulosederivaten | [1992/21] | English: | Process for the isolation and purification of cellulose ethers and other derivatives of cellulose | [1992/21] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation et la purification des éthers et d'autres dérivés de la cellulose | [1992/21] |
Former [1989/10] | Verfahren und Anlage zur Abtrennung und Reinigung von Celluloseethern und anderen Cellulosederivaten | ||
Former [1989/10] | Process and apparatus for the isolation and purification of cellulose ethers and other derivatives of cellulose | ||
Former [1989/10] | Procédé et dispositif pour la séparation et la purification des éthers et d'autres dérivés de la cellulose | Examination procedure | 27.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 01.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3451999 (EVANS RICHARD L); | [Y]EP0053741 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE], et al); | [Y]EP0153972 (SCHUMACHER HEINZ); | [A]EP0194877 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) |