EP0318811 - Improved power stage with increased output dynamics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stefani, Fabrizio Via Appennini 16 I-21010 Cardano al Campo Varese / IT | 02 /
Gola, Alberto Via Eseguiti 22 bis I-27043 Broni Pavia / IT | 03 /
Pessina, Gianluigi Via Roma 65 I-20020 Lainate Milano / IT | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88119473.2 | 23.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | IT19870022880 | 03.12.1987 Original published format: IT 2288087 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0318811 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0318811 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02, H03F3/21 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
H03F1/0261 (EP,US);
H03F3/211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1989/23] | Title | German: | Leistungsstufe mit vergrösserter Ausgangsdynamik | [1989/23] | English: | Improved power stage with increased output dynamics | [1989/23] | French: | Amplificateur de puissance à dynamique de sortie agrandie | [1989/23] | File destroyed: | 05.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/28] | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.10.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5940714 ; | [Y]US4206419 (YOKOYAMA KENJI [JP]); | [A]GB2072979 (SRA COMMUNICATIONS AB); | [A]EP0133506 (ATES COMPONENTI ELETTRON [IT]); | [A]EP0148563 (NELSON DAVID A [US], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 131 (E-251)[1568]19th June 1984; & JP-A-59 40 714 (ANRITSU DENKI K.K.) 06-03-1984 |