EP0320718 - Variable speed pumping-up system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | For all designated states The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc. 3-22, Nakanoshima-3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
For all designated states THE KANSAI ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC. 3-22, Nakanoshima-3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuwabara, Takao 1-13, Nishi narusawa-cho 4-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Hisao 7-4, Minami kouya-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | 03 /
Nakagawa, Hiroto 16-201,1, Wakayamadai 2-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618 / JP | 04 /
Kita, Eizo 14-3-502, Kawahigashi-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612 / JP | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120159.4 | 02.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | JP19870318846 | 18.12.1987 Original published format: JP 31884687 | JP19870318850 | 18.12.1987 Original published format: JP 31885087 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0320718 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0320718 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F03B15/06 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
F03B15/06 (EP,US);
F03B15/04 (KR);
Y02E10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1989/25] | Title | German: | Pumpturbine mit veränderlicher Drehzahl | [1989/25] | English: | Variable speed pumping-up system | [1989/25] | French: | Groupe turbine-pompe à vitesse de révolution variable | [1989/25] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 30.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 01.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP62186069 ; | [AD]JP61175271 ; | [A]JP61173698 ; | [A]EP0243937 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4610599 (LONG RAY A [US]); | [AP]US4754156 (SHIOZAKI JUNICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4474528 (YOKOYAMA TOSHIAKI [JP]); | [A]US4201925 (KUWABARA TAKAO [JP], et al); | [T]US4354800 (KUWABARA TAKAO); | [T]GB1140128 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 31 (M-663)[2878], 29th January 1988; & JP-A-62 186 069 (HITACHI LTD) 14-08-1987, & JP62186069 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 385 (M-548)[2442], 24th December 1986; & JP-A-61 175 271 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 06-08-1986, & JP61175271 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 384 (E-466)[2441], 23rd December 1986; & JP-A-61 173 698 (KANSAI ELECTRIC POWER CO. INC.) 05-08-1986, & JP61173698 A 00000000 |