Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] |
03.07.1991 | First examination report | |
20.06.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] |
14.01.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.03.1989 [1989/09] |