Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0304974 | Global Dossier | 01.03.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE8700892 | 10.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1000820 | 11.04.1989 | A7 | Priority number | Date | BE8700892 | 10.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6450744 | 27.02.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | BE8700892 | 10.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4920295 | 24.04.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | BE8700892 | 10.08.1987 |